U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chase
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 13, 2018: [Furlough]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Quash]
  • June 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 13, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Request]
  • June 04, 2018: [Bail Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 30, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.