U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:86-cr-30020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Old FRC Case Documents]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • August 21, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • August 16, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • August 02, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • July 19, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • June 14, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
  • June 01, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Old FRC Case Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.