U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40269
  • Case Name: Heartland Properties Community Trust
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Striking Document]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.