U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 29, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 30, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Response]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2018: [Request]
  • June 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.