U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50129
  • Case Name: Shane Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • June 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Creditor List]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.