U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30032
  • Case Name: Robert Lewis Reeves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.