U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40281
  • Case Name: Jessica Urrabazo Flores
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.