U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30034
  • Case Name: William Henry Bartling and Melinda Sue Bartling
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.