U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04007
  • Case Name: Honken v. TCS, Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Returned Email]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 02, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • July 18, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Additional Summons Issued]
  • July 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • June 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint - USE ONLY WHEN INSTRUCTED BY COURT]
  • June 12, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.