U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Crow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 26, 2018: [Request]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Request]
  • July 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.