U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waukechon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 19, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Response]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 04, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 04, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 15, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 26, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 04, 2019: [Request]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arrest]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2018: [Joinder]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 14, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 19, 2018: [Request]
  • June 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Request]
  • June 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Request]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.