U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2020: [Release from Custody]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 12, 2018: [Furlough]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Request]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 26, 2018: [Request]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.