U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Small Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 05, 2021: [Response]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 19, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 08, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • April 02, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2018: [Request]
  • July 30, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.