U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Kettle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 31, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 08, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • November 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 01, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2018: [For Order]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • October 23, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 07, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 10, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 19, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Request]
  • June 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.