U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pomani
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 01, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Request]
  • July 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.