U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40287
  • Case Name: Mark Allen Meier and Barbara Ann Meier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • January 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2020
  • May 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
March, 2020
  • March 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume/Reject (deactivated)]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compel Assumption or Rejection of Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by Creditor)]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume/Reject (deactivated)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compel Assumption or Rejection of Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by Creditor)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume/Reject (deactivated)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compel Assumption or Rejection of Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by Creditor)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice (Nonstandard)(deactivated)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.