U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soularie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 04, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • June 04, 2019: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • June 04, 2019: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Transport Defendant]
  • June 25, 2018: [Request]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 25, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.