U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04066
  • Case Name: Mader v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 21, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • July 06, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Return of Service Executed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Return of Service Executed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 14, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 14, 2018: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.