U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Higgins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 29, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 06, 2020: [Supplement]
  • February 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 03, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 05, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 14, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 20, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.