U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiseley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2021: [Request]
  • February 01, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 04, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 08, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 30, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Document Sealed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2018
  • November 12, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2018: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • October 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Furlough]
  • September 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 30, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 24, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Suppress]
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Request]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.