U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blacksmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 15, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 15, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 24, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 19, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Evaluation]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 01, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 27, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2018: [Request]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 19, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 19, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.