U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 12, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 12, 2019: [Extend]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 30, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • December 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2018: [Brief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 23, 2018: [Furlough]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2018: [Request]
  • June 22, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 19, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.