U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freyn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 14, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Receipt]
  • June 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Transport Defendant]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 31, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Request]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.