U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 09, 2018: [Discovery]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response]
  • June 28, 2018: [Request]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 21, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.