U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04070
  • Case Name: Alphin v. Goosmann Law Firm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2019: [Mail Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Discovery Report]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 31, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • June 27, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 20, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • June 20, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
  • June 20, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.