U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50150
  • Case Name: Bradley Jo Griffith and Craig Thomas Popp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • January 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Returned Funds/New Estate Funds]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Returned Funds/New Estate Funds]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
August, 2019
  • August 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.