U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 24, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Waiver]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 17, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Detainer Lodged]
  • August 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 07, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 05, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 01, 2018: [Consent]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 09, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 03, 2018: [Bail Report]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Request]
  • June 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 21, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.