U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 08, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 26, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 22, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.