U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04073
  • Case Name: Rose v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Letter Sent]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2018: [Received]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 22, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 22, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.