U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 30, 2018: [Discovery]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response]
  • June 29, 2018: [Request]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.