U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez-Benitez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • February 22, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Mail Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Response]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 28, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 09, 2019: [Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 16, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response]
  • August 03, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2018: [Request]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.