U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeBoer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 03, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Certificate]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 30, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 25, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.