U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05033
  • Case Name: Wetch v. Crum & Forster Commercial Ins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Objection]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 23, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 22, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 15, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 13, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 21, 2019: [Response]
  • May 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 08, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 05, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 11, 2019: [Leave to]
  • March 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Leave to]
  • March 04, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • February 07, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 17, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response]
  • January 03, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2019: [Briefing Schedule]
  • January 02, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Protective Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 20, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 20, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 12, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stay]
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 17, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 17, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 03, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 02, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 28, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.