U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04008
  • Case Name: Winter v. Winter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Set Status Conference]
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Nonstandard Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Brief]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stipulated Facts]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.