U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 12, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 23, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 28, 2019: [Certificate]
  • June 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Certificate]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 06, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arrest]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Request]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 26, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 26, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.