U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05002
  • Case Name: Allred v. Plains Commerce Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.