U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Request]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.