U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50069-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Wells et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 02, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • October 30, 2020: [Admission]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 30, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 30, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 03, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 25, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Response]
  • December 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 26, 2019: [Response]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 12, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 05, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 08, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 06, 2019: [Letter]
  • March 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 07, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • February 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Competency Evaluation]
  • February 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Furlough]
  • January 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 26, 2018: [Request]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 24, 2018: [Request]
  • September 21, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 21, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2018: [Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.