U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40303
  • Case Name: Bryon David Stapella and Lori Anne Stapella
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.