U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50155
  • Case Name: Neil Glenn Pryor, Jr. and Lorna Jean Pryor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • August 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.