U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Back
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 13, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 19, 2021: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 13, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 13, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 13, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 12, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 19, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 31, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Request]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.