U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30060-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Siers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 20, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 01, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Request]
  • July 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.