U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40307
  • Case Name: Sagawatee (NMN) Ektnitphong and Debra Kay Ektnitphong
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Secured Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.