U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steward et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Response]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 23, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2019: [Proposed Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Order]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Furlough]
  • August 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 24, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 24, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 29, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • May 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2019: [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Joinder]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 15, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Request]
  • July 27, 2018: [Request]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2018: [Request]
  • July 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.