U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaving
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2018: [Request]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2018: [Request]
  • July 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.