U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Breaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Receipt]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Memorandum Letter]
  • January 12, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • August 07, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 04, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 23, 2020: [Response]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 10, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 01, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 20, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 20, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 29, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2018: [Request]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.