U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loza-Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response]
  • July 17, 2018: [Request]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 11, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • July 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.