U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cathey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 25, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2022: [DEACTIVATED_Set Aside Sentence]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set Aside Sentence]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • August 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 01, 2021: [Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 18, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 15, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 13, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 13, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 11, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Verdict]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 23, 2020: [Objection]
  • January 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Leave to]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 06, 2020: [Leave to]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Set Aside Verdict]
  • December 10, 2019: [New Trial]
  • December 02, 2019: [Set Aside Verdict]
  • December 02, 2019: [New Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 22, 2019: [Verdict]
  • November 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • November 20, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 17, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 13, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Jury List]
  • November 13, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 11, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 11, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • November 11, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 09, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • November 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2019: [In Limine]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 30, 2019: [Response]
  • September 27, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • September 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 22, 2019: [Response]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 15, 2019: [Disclosure ]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 16, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Text Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.