U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tommeraasen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 16, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Supplement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 25, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 09, 2018: [Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.