U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30036
  • Case Name: William James Huber and Kenda Kaye Huber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Adequate Protection]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Request]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.